Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3418 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16824 Week
» 69840 Month
» 189367 Year
» 3216220 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8524 |
m/e |
12/1944 |
British Railways |
48524 |
w/e |
01/04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
During 12/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 08/04/1964 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 4 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8524 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
19/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (23B) |
|
|
01/04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48524 |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
22/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
08/04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48524 |
|
|
08/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|