|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
27/06/1965 | Crewe Works (Erecting shop) | Erecting shop: D1859/60/1, D1962-7, D202/11/32/4/95, D338/50/2, D1508/12/18/29/30/43/54/68, D5709/15, D8015/24, 44669/963, 45018/227/435/93, 48012/111/67/271/322/445/93/507/51/727, 70035/54, 92011/49/50/137/234. Electric shop: E3059/78/80/2/3, E26000. New Diesel shop: D222, D284, D290, D396, D1501/15/61, D1633. Paint shop: D1853/5-8, E3038/87, E26045, D8021, 71000 (stored outside). Traverser Area: 44679, 45327, 48116/768, D240, D1511/21, E3072. Side of Works: 44673/8/877/5004/190, 48474, 92021/212, 70023. Ex-Works: D248, D342, D1615/35/88, D6885, 44759, 45200, 45444/8, 48055, 70039, 92054/247. New diesel shop is the old 'cutting up' shop which has been converted into a light diesel repair shop. | SLS/196508 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1945 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8493 Built at Horwich Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) | ||
19/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northampton (2C) | ||
08/10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48493 | ||
10/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
17/08/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) | ||
10/07/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
03/02/1968 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northwich (8E) | ||
09/03/1968 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
11/05/1968 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) | ||
03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48493 | ||
04/1969 | Scrapped | Scrapped |