Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1514 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19317 Week
» 72333 Month
» 191860 Year
» 3218713 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8492 |
m/e |
07/1945 |
British Railways |
48492 |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 07/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/02/1968 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8492 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
11/02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48492 |
|
|
14/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kettering (15C) |
|
|
29/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
26/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
11/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E) |
|
|
18/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
10/02/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48492 |
|
|
05/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|