|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/05/1959 | Chester MPD (6E) | The W.R. has taken over all freight workings of this shed (now under LMR control) and as a result have gained back from the LMR all the locomotives transferred in exchange for W.R. types. Engines transferred LMR to WR to cover these freight workings are-48402/12/5/7/8/24/30/44/71, 73021/3/4/5/6, 75005/6/26. The only engines left at 6E now are several 82XXX tanks and a few standards. | SLS/195907 |
30/12/1962 | Western Regionboundary changes | The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. | SLS/196303 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/04/1945 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8471 Built at Swindon Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Rose Grove (24B) | ||
23/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hellifield (20G) | ||
21/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kettering (15B) | ||
01/04/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48471 | ||
16/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Banbury (84C) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester West (6E) | ||
11/04/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) | ||
13/08/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
07/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) | ||
30/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A) | ||
28/05/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) | ||
11/11/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9L) | ||
09/03/1968 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) | ||
27/04/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48471 from Heaton Mersey (9F) | ||
09/1968 | Scrapped | Scrapped |