|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1947 | Severn Tunnel Junction MPD | Although most of the L.M.S. '8F' 2-8-0 have been returned three were seen recently at Severn Tunnel Junction viz: Nos. 8466/7/77. It seems likely that these will be amongst the last four to be returned. | SLS/194710 |
18/10/1947 | General | The return of 8467/77 completes the handing over of the eighty L.M.S. (G.W. built) engines to the L.M.S. Ry. | SLS/194712 |
05/11/1961 | Derby Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Sidings: 12000, 42332, 42404, 43368, 43826, 43905/75, 44033, 44581, 47268, 47529, 47666, Cecil Raikes. Gasworks Siding: 44263, 47472. Erecting Shop: D3015/22, 12054/68/84, 12100, 13123, 41804, 42421, 42503, 43593, 43620, 44130, 44241, 44401, 44560, 47298, 47521, 48009, 48110/85/92, 48304/80, 48467, 58850, 73073, 73156/8, 75030/52. Diesel Finishing Shop: D89, D140/2/3, D8017/37. Diesel Test House: D141, D211/26. Outside Diesel Test House: D43, D80, D2501. New Erecting Shop: D144-54. Diesel Shunter Test House: 13122. Paint Shop: M.R.1000. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2908/9, D5024, D5143, 10202/3, 11145. Outside Diesel Repair Shop: D2504, 11118. Shed Road: 41168, 42328, 42510/21/4, 43295. | SLS/196112 |
17/11/1961 | Derby MPD (17A) (Ex-Works on Shed) | Ex-Works on Shed: D211, D5024, 41804, 42421, 44241, 48185, 48467, 73073, 75030/52. | SLS/196112 |
14/11/1965 | Crewe South Shed (Waiting works) | Ex-works: 43151, 45277, 48201. Waiting works: D1525, 44763, 45142/226, 46527, 48093/112, 48467, 92023. | SLS/196512 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/03/1945 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8467 Built at Swindon Works |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ) | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) | ||
30/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48467 | ||
08/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Normanton (20D) | ||
19/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kettering (15B) | ||
19/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Coalville (15E) | ||
06/11/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) | ||
25/06/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
11/05/1968 | Allocation | Reallocated to Patricroft (9H) | ||
15/06/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48467 | ||
01/1969 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |