Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1019 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24650 Week
» 89604 Month
» 292268 Year
» 3319121 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8466 |
on |
24/02/1945 |
British Railways |
48466 |
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
353 |
To Service |
Mon 24/02/1945 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 08/05/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1947 |
Severn Tunnel Junction MPD |
Although most of the L.M.S. '8F' 2-8-0 have been returned three were seen recently at Severn Tunnel Junction viz: Nos. 8466/7/77. It seems likely that these will be amongst the last four to be returned. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/02/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8466 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
10/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
18/03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48466 |
|
|
08/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (20C) |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (20C) |
|
|
08/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48466 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|