|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/07/1966 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 45041/187/203/54/312, 48076/151/356/465/622, 75029, 92069/154, D223/35/56/87/91, D360, D1563/4/89/94, D1612/82/90, D1724/51/9/72, D5717, D8026/49, D1102-9. Electric shop: E3033/8/42/3/89, 26037; Adjoining Electric shop: D1500/14/8/687/715/60/813/58/88, D244, D297, D5252/7, D7584/5, 27000. Paint shop area: D200, D277, D342, D1101, D1716, D1841, D5709. Traverser area: 26009, 27005, D333, D1510/78/632/50/70/743/8/851/79/906/9, D5714, E3011/44/86. Test area: D397, D1542/59/82/95/710/7, D5275. Old C shop: E3016/45/67/173, D5102/3, D5704. Side of works: D386, D1581, D1853, D5710, 44779, 60007 for restoration, 70051, 71000, 75062. | SLS/196609 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/02/1945 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8465 Built at Swindon Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) | ||
14/08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48465 | ||
27/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
12/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northwich (8E) | ||
06/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
26/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) | ||
07/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) | ||
09/03/1968 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bolton (9K) | ||
16/03/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48465 | ||
07/1968 | Scrapped | Scrapped |