Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1631 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15037 Week
» 68053 Month
» 187580 Year
» 3214433 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8449 |
on |
01/08/1944 |
British Railways |
48449 |
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
353 |
To Service |
Sat 01/08/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 20/05/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 9 mths , 19 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/06/1967 |
Crewe South MPD (condemned or waiting Works) |
Stored-LNER 4498, 44843, 45042, 45243/64/98, 45353/91, 45494; condemned or waiting Works-43024/34, 44666/85, 44737/79, 44800/12/4/60/5, 45006/33, 45197, 45446, 47566, 48011/449/502/548/705, 71000, 78036, 92032. |
SLS/196708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/08/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8449 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Goole (25C) |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48449 |
|
|
12/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (1H) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
12/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48449 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|