Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1077 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18880 Week
» 71896 Month
» 191423 Year
» 3218276 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8443 |
on |
15/06/1944 |
British Railways |
48443 |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
353 |
To Service |
Mon 15/06/1944 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/06/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8443 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Royston (20C) |
|
|
24/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48443 |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourton (20B) |
|
|
24/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (55D) |
|
|
11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48443 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|