Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 613 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14656 Week
» 79610 Month
» 282274 Year
» 3309127 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8440 |
on |
05/06/1944 |
British Railways |
48440 |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
353 |
To Service |
Sat 05/06/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 18/02/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/06/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8440 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
26/03/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (TN) (On Loan to GWR) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LMS) (19G) |
|
|
29/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48440 |
|
|
03/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
10/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
01/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (1H) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C) |
|
|
18/02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48440 |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|