Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2263 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 16306 Week
» 81260 Month
» 283924 Year
» 3310777 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8428 |
on |
17/01/1944 |
British Railways |
48428 |
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
349 |
To Service |
Wed 17/01/1944 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/01/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8428 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Chester West (CHR) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
11/03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48428 |
|
|
18/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48428 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|