Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2786 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16192 Week
» 69208 Month
» 188735 Year
» 3215588 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8422 |
on |
10/12/1943 |
British Railways |
48422 |
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
349 |
To Service |
Sat 10/12/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 26/03/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/12/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8422 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Northampton (2C) |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48422 |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (8L) |
|
|
26/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G) |
|
|
26/03/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48422 |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|