31/12/1948 |
Crewe Works |
New Work December: 'IVĀ° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with. Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque. |
SLS/194902 |
31/01/1949 |
Crewe Works |
Locomotives entering Works during January included Nos. C.D. No. 7, 2236, 2428/46/53/74, 2562/79/80/98, 2624/74/85/86, 4777, 4812/23/68/76, 4965, 5103/6/29/49, 5200/22/84/94, 5317/18/53/54/72/75/83, 5427/49, 5516/24/94/98, 5650/65/84, 5719, 6111/18/22/28/45/46/64, 6204/50, 7181, 7937/51/73/81/85, 8007/80/93/96, 8177/99, 8220/5, 8327/38/45/47, 8417/24/35/42, 8501/2, 8607/28/49, 8705/23/70, 8892/4, 8909/35, 9217/27/90, 9386, 25673, 27591, 27635, 28337, 42150, 42225, 42458, 42589, 42619, 44753/66, 44822/70, 45027/76, 45513/30/65/72/89, 45618/60/85, 45721, 46220/21/29/39, 46603, 48004, 48114, 49307. During the past month new construction accounted for a further six Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E472. They were completed as follows:- Nos. 44729 (7/1), 44730 (12/1), 44731 (17/1), 44732 (24/1), 44733 (28/1) and 44734 (3/2); the last three engines of this order are already in an advanced state of completion. The latest 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0 to be rebuilt is No. 45522-completed on 21/1; at the present time no more are in hand. Since the cessation of hostilities the former L.M.S.Rly. have fitted several different types of speedometer to certain of their 4-6-0 locomotives. These experiments were carried a stage further last month when during W.E. 22/1 Class '7P' No. 46257 was fitted with a Smiths type speedometer driven from the pony truck axle, the generator being mounted on the left-hand axlebox. Ex L.N.W. 'Cauliflower' 0-6-0's. Nos. 58409/12 were fitted for snowplough duties during the same week. The equipment includes ex-tended cab roofs, and look-out windows (similar to those seen on many brake vans) mounted on the cab sides. Since October last, several 'Dean' 0-6-0 pannier tanks have undergone heavy repairs here; those having passed through Works to date include Nos. 2021/67, 2100/09/11/15/27/50/84/85. All have had their numberplates painted red, with the numerals scoured bright. Another ex L. & Y. 0-6-0ST has been added to the stud of Works' shunting locomotives-No. 11444, which now brings the total of ex L. & Y. engines represented to three. |
SLS/194903 |
30/05/1959 |
Chester MPD (6E) |
The W.R. has taken over all freight workings of this shed (now under LMR control) and as a result have gained back from the LMR all the locomotives transferred in exchange for W.R. types. Engines transferred LMR to WR to cover these freight workings are-48402/12/5/7/8/24/30/44/71, 73021/3/4/5/6, 75005/6/26. The only engines left at 6E now are several 82XXX tanks and a few standards. |
SLS/195907 |
11/02/1960 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay) |
Paint Shop-MR1000, 42293 I, 42513 I, 44223 I, 48079 I. Diesel Erecting Shop-10000, 12074/5/98, 13173, D2220, D2901, D8012, ED4/6. New Work-6 diesel shunters D3937-3942 New. Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay -42053 I, 42152 I, 42372 G, 43903 I, 43967 G, 44203/7 I, 44222 G, 44509 I, 47287 G, 47469 G, 47596 G, 47648 I, 48187 G, 48413/7 G, 73070 G, 75038 I, 80092 G. Stripping-42340, 42516, 43410; Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay: 8 d/e shunters D3943-49/51, 42540 Casual, 42396 Stripping; Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-10100 Cut, D5014 Damage repairs, 10 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. d/e (D5075-84), 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. d/e. Test House-D10, D5072. Diesel Finishing Shop-D5015, D5073/4, D5716. Yard-40025, 40413/582/654, 42387, 43256/428/510/31/665/759, 43933/7/95, 44158/344/55/510, 47238, 47609, 48098/9, 58219/61, 92135, D4, D5, D6. |
SLS/196003 |
30/12/1962 |
Western Regionboundary changes |
The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. |
SLS/196303 |
17/03/1963 |
Carlisle Kingmoor MPD |
In steam at Kingmoor on 17th March were 46223/6/44/55. Stored on same day at Kingmoor were-42320, 42830/4/7/75/82-4/99, 42906, 44341, 45640/80,18, 46124/200/1, 47211/81, 47342/58, 47481, 58160 an 90763. |
SLS/196304 |
11/04/1963 |
Derby Works |
Erecting Shop- No. 1 bay: 41535, 43915 being cut up, 47276, 48274, 73086/91, 75059, D2220, D2913, D3020, D3178, ED6/7; Erecting Shop- No. 2 bay: D73, D123 an D5093; Erecting Shop- No. 3 bay: D5203-5215 new construction. Diesel Erecting Shop: D33, D42, D78, D82/3, D90/2, D127. Diesel Finishing Shop: D4, D40, D5200-2 under construction. Paint Shop: D5196/7. Test House: D55, D64, D109, D140, D5082, D5191, D5198/9. Yard (by paint shop): 40157, 42146 an 42585 broken up; 47003 frames; D7, D61, D126, D149, D152, D2236, D5010/20/76/82/90/1, D5143/92/4/5. Foundry Sdg.: 40022, 42302/29/91, 42472, 42500, 44100, D2911. Stone Pit: 44268, 73021. |
SLS/196304 |
27/04/1963 |
Birmingham Excursions |
On Saturday, 27th April, fifteen excursions were run from Southampton area for the football match at Villa Park; ten travelled via Basingstoke, Oxford and Leamington utilising 34028/40/2/5/50/2/88/94/8 whilst 7919(81D) had taken over from a failed Wset Country in the Reading area. Three travelled by same route to Oxford thence Worcester and Stourbridge Junc. being piloted therefrom by LMR 8Fs, the pilots working through to Snow Hill instead of being detached at Oldbury after climbing Old Hill bank-viz. 34009/48417, 34039/48478 and 34046/48430; the remaining two arrived at New St. behind Bristol jubilees 45682/90, one having travelled via the SDJR and the other via Salisbury. On same date, B1 61105(41A) worked a Manchester-Stratford-on-Avon special but was replaced on return working by Hall 6948 after 'failing' at Tyseley; it was used by latter shed during the next week on local turns. |
SLS/196304 |