31/10/1945 |
Swindon Works |
Locos entering works during October, 1945: 2184, 2206, 2530/41, 2638, 2805/14/72/3/82/8, 2915/33/46, 3025/36, 3656, 3810/3/66, 4016/7/32/40/4154/618/96, 4517/51/64/80, 4603/17/41/53/65, 4704, 4818/31/6, 4925/9/47, 5065/84, 5208/37, 5312/56/81, 5422, 5508/22/66/72, 5718/23, 5902/21/4/8/9/64 6000/6/9/24, 6116, 6378/9, 6437, 6732/9, 6955, 7214, 7719/26/40, 8741/6, 9304/17, 9702/64. L.M.S. 8402/6/14. L.N.E. K3 17. |
SLS/194602 |
30/05/1959 |
Chester MPD (6E) |
The W.R. has taken over all freight workings of this shed (now under LMR control) and as a result have gained back from the LMR all the locomotives transferred in exchange for W.R. types. Engines transferred LMR to WR to cover these freight workings are-48402/12/5/7/8/24/30/44/71, 73021/3/4/5/6, 75005/6/26. The only engines left at 6E now are several 82XXX tanks and a few standards. |
SLS/195907 |
30/12/1962 |
Western Regionboundary changes |
The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. |
SLS/196303 |
29/10/1967 |
Crewe South MPD (Stored) |
45285/7, 48018, 48729, 92047, 70004/24/31/45. Stored-48402, LNER 4498. Withdrawn-D2519, 15000/2, 42647, 43001/3/7/21, 44680/1/4, 44765, 44805/8/12/4/21/32/3/43/60/5, 44944, 45006/21/42/52/60/89,45186, 45243/70/8/97/8, 45308, 45405/94, 46520, 48220, 48364, 48474, 48521/2/48, 48603/43, 48725/67, 75029, 76051, 92100. |
SLS/196712 |