|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/02/1962 | Crewe Works (Works Sidings) | Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through £50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. | SLS/196203 |
16/01/1966 | Crewe South MPD (ex Works) | ex Works: 44971, 46505, 48400. Waiting Works: 48276. Also on Crewe S. shed 61158 (36A). | SLS/196602 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/05/1943 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8400 Built at Swindon Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A) | ||
17/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
26/06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48400 | ||
20/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) | ||
05/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
06/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) | ||
19/02/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) | ||
06/05/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) | ||
23/09/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) | ||
03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48400 | ||
12/1968 | Scrapped | Scrapped |