|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/05/1962 | Derby Works (Klondyke Sidings) | Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D63, D70, D84, D105, D168, D3117, D5028/88. Test House: D166/7, 13306, Midland Pullman coaches Nos. u60091/2, u60732/42. Shunter test house: D3067. New Building: D171-D180. Finishing Shop: D81, D169/170, 10203. Erecting Shop: D2504/8, D3019/68, D3368, 13051, 13120, 42071, 42178, 43949, 44210/33/44, 44571, 47004, 47228, 48098, 48386, 53808, 73053, 73140/58. Paint Shop: MR1000, 48687 (15D). 'Stone Pit': 48183, 73039. 'Foundry Row': 41168, 42099, 42352, 43263, 43410/35, 47340/66. 'Bone Yard': 42332. 'Klondyke Sidings': ED1, 12000, 42069, 42283, 43985, 44154, 44561, 44583, 48381. Shop Road: 44049/92, 48261/72, 68030. Works Shunt: D2377, D3168. EXPLANATORY NOTES-Stone Pit: Track adjoining Diesel Finishing Shop. Foundry Row: Name explains itself. Bone Yard: Dump opposite station adjoining main Works Offices. Klondyke: Works arrival sidings between new Paint Shop and Test House. |
SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1944 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8381 Built at Horwich Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A) | ||
15/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kettering (15B) | ||
18/03/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48381 | ||
11/08/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) | ||
23/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) | ||
11/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kettering (15C) | ||
18/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) | ||
19/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Burton (16F) | ||
24/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) | ||
26/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) | ||
28/05/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Agecroft (9J) | ||
22/10/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Patricroft (9H) | ||
25/11/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48381 from Patricroft (9H) | ||
03/1968 | Scrapped | Scrapped |