Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 367 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18170 Week
» 71186 Month
» 190713 Year
» 3217566 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8343 |
m/e |
02/1944 |
British Railways |
48343 |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 02/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 18/02/1967 |
Service Life |
23 yrs , 18 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Nuneaton |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
5w/e |
12/03/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/02/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8343 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48343 |
|
|
11/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
18/02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48343 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|