10/03/1959 |
Derby Works (Erecting shop No 1 bay) |
Paint shop-42396I, 42501I, 44426I, 48010G, 48517G, D5010 new. Diesel erecting shop-10202, 10800, 11127, 12001, 12066, 12088, 13028, 6 0-6-0 DIE shunters (new work), (D3763-8). Erecting shop No 1 bay-40684I, 42409G, 42515G, 43850 G, 44123 I, 44134 I, 44179 G, 47454 G, 47645 G, 47679 I, 48141 I, 48335 G, 73142 I, 73157 I, 75015 I, 75028 G, 75031 G, 75041 G, stripping-42522, 44162, 48621, 80067. Erecting shop No. 2 bay-42374I, 44102 G, 44130 I, 47425 I, 48223(1), 73130 I, 73141 I, stripping-42529, 47526. Erecting shop No. 3 bay-6 Bo-Bo (D5014-19 new) 1160 H.P. D/E, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/E Yard-40047/564/680/1000/49/143/57/65, 42354/509/98, 43292/324, 44145/599, 47309, 48194/304/653/699, 10001, 10100, D5009/13 and Cecil Raikes. All stored locos. remain with following additions-47563 (opp. station and not for scrap), 40461, 41121, 43553/946/70, 47426 (opp. m.p.d.). *41000 was noted on 22nd March in the Erecting shop stripped down; also noted on this date in the shops were 40671 an 53807. |
SLS/195904 |
17/08/1959 |
Derby Works (Yard) |
Paint shop-MR 1000, 44579, 48390; Diesel Erecting Shop-12047/95, 13084/118/9/72, D3771, ED4; New Work-11 D/E sh. 0-6-0, D3782-92 new; Test House-D2, D3781, D5021; Diesel Finishing shop- D3/4, D5008/22/3; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay, 42415I, 42517/36G, 44122I, 44172G, 44214G, 44279/377I, 44389/402 G, 44468I, 44472G, 48053/346/77/463G; Also, 42395, 44166/191, 80091stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42393I, 44164I, 47453I, 75057I, 80144I, 73014stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P.-D5024-31new, 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P, D5-D8new; Yard-40047/680, 42257/308/27/54/400/624, 43210/386/982, 44092/139/154/169, 45250, 47309, 48335/392/418, 48715 frames, 58213, 10000/203/800, D5020, D5700/17, Cecil Rakes. |
SLS/195909 |
04/06/1961 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. |
SLS/196107 |
12/08/1964 |
Crewe Works (Dismantling Shed) |
Arrival Sidings: 41264, 42233/581/651, 44836/8/934, 45005/38/249, 46487, 48050/205/301/556/617, 78023, 84028. Paint Shop: D1589, D1611/2/3/5/6, 26057, 27006, L.M.S. 6233 Duchess of Sutherland (painted in L.M.S. livery for Butlin's Camp, Ayrshire), 49395, Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D230/41/82, D302/22, D1610, D6826/36, 48641. Paint Shop Yard: 42210/152, 48158/62/462, 78010, 92203. Diesel Test Road: D207, D1614, D8053. Erecting Shop: New Construction D1619-D1636 in various stages of construction, D203/74/6/9/83, D304/6/29/33/84/6, D5719, D6843, D8009/13/17/55, 42134/577/611, 44695/946, 45003/338, 45558, 48104/36/215/18/87/305/531/710/67, 92001/59/166/77, 92205/12. No. 9 Shop: D1617/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 48010/193/466, 84026, 92042. Works Yard: D217/8/89/91, D350, D5706/16, D6758, D8045, 42115/697, 44593/937, 45297/325, 48002/153/267/426/548/53/676, 70001/9/36/51, 78044. Electric Traction Shop: E3021, 26033/52, D288, D315/24. Scrap Road: 48069/155/203/310/657/745, 84021/2. Dismantling Shed: 42090/614/86, 48335/64/494/540, 84025, 92065. |
SLS/196409 |
20/09/1964 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. |
SLS/196410 |