Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1165 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18968 Week
» 71984 Month
» 191511 Year
» 3218364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8323 |
m/e |
02/1944 |
British Railways |
48323 |
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
Lot-158 |
To Service |
During 02/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/06/1968 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8323 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-158 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (16B) |
|
|
30/07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48323 |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12B) |
|
|
16/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12B) |
|
|
02/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
14/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
13/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
22/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) |
|
|
29/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48323 |
|
|
12/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|