Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1065 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24696 Week
» 89650 Month
» 292314 Year
» 3319167 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
70311 |
m/e |
07/1940 |
British Railways |
48248 |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
To Service |
During 07/1940 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/01/1966 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys |
Information |
WD 311 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
STOCK |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
4w/e |
12/06/1954 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
5w/e |
12/10/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/01/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1948 |
Crewe Works |
New construction for the past month produced only three Caprotti 4-6-0's: No. 44756 (No. 9 of Order E468) completed on 10/5, and No. 44741 and 44742 (Nos. 4 & 5 of Order E.469) completed on 18/5 and 28/5 respectively. Condemned engines cut-up during the past month were dealt with a follows: W/E 8/5 Nos. 7821, 9250; W/E 15/5 Nos. 7769, 9038; W/E 22/5 Nos. 6673, 6738, 9013; W/E 29/5 Nos. 6740, 6920, 25373 an 28484. A number of War Department 2-8-0's of the standard L.M.S. '8F' type have recently returned from the Middle East, and are at present stored in the old carriage works. They are Nos. 70300/01/11/14/18/32/63/94/95/98, 70401/2/3/13/38/43/46/49, 70504/18/76/77/79/82/88 an 70611. Several of these engines are fitted with steam turbo-generators mounted on the right-hand side of the firebox, but no electric lights are in evidence, although conduit piping still exists along the boilers of a few engines. Eight locomotives were recently painted in the new experimental liveries of the British Railways Six Class '7P' 4-6-2's Nos. 46224/27/30/1/2/41 were painted blue (the shade approaching that of Oxford blue), and lined in accordance gwith ex L.N.W.R. practice, whilst two Class '6P' 4-6-0's Nos. 45540 an 46139 were painted green (a shade closely resembling the standard L.N.E.R. green) and also lined in the ex L.N.W.R. style. All eight engines had their buffers, cylinder covers, motion, etc., scoured bright |
SLS/194807 |
27/02/1966 |
Crewe South MPD (Waiting Works) |
Ex Works: 44806, 45350, 48683, 70045; Waiting Works: 44813, 45235/48, 47480/681, 48248, 78034. |
SLS/196604 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1940 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 70311 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
12/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48248 |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (8E) |
|
|
12/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
01/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48248 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|