Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 846 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18649 Week
» 71665 Month
» 191192 Year
» 3218045 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8221 |
m/e |
09/1942 |
British Railways |
48221 |
w/e |
03/06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Works Number |
24811 |
To Service |
During 09/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/02/1967 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8221 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24811 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A) |
|
|
03/06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48221 |
|
|
27/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kettering (15C) |
|
|
07/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (8E) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
04/02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48221 |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|