23/02/1950 |
Derby Works |
New work: On 23/2 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42137-39 were complete-No, 42137 being in the Paint Shop-No, 42140 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42141 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12067/68 were complete, while No. 12067 was noted in the Paint Shop-painted, with crest. Locomotives entering Works during: january: These included Nos. 40046, 49, 40322, 436, 490, 512, 40518/33, 540, 40553/59, 40601, 698, 40927, 937, 1043, 41057/76/81, 1112, 41114, 1252, 1425, 41532, 1686, 1711/20/26, 1835, 41873, 2306, 42320/46, 2365, 42392, 42405, 42504/07/13/25, 3228, 43329, 3429/53/94, 3605/20/55/60, 3714/24, 3804/13/30/67, 44017/47, 44131, 44262, 4423, 44466, 4468, 44482, 4522, 4557/81, 4820, 45305, 48205, 13806, 22984, W.R. No. 2112. On 5/1 No. 42363 was noted in the Paint Shop, fitted with outside steam pipes. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40045, 40163, 40553, 40634, 40917, 41094, 41166/74/88, 42310/63. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41682, 41711, 41859, 43431, 43524, 43658/60, 43714/23, 43917/50/64, 44423, 44601, 47409/21/99, 47528/51, 47623/31, while Nos. 40059, 40395, 40518, 40698, 41043, 41533, 41686, 42341/59/80, 42524/28, 43228, 43724, 43847, 43944, 47241, 47438, 53806 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 6/1 No. 40459; W/E 13/1 Nos. 1768, 7058, 9588; W/E 20/1 No.2100; W/E 27/1 No. 3813. Nos, 490, 512, an 3830 were also cut up during January, while No. 9573 was in the process of being cut up on 27/1. |
SLS/195003 |
17/12/1959 |
Derby Works (Yard) |
Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42527 I, 47616 G, 48326 G, 80082 G, D3801, D5066 (New). Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12093/7, D3053, D5705/16, D8209. New Work: D3802, D3937-41, Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026, D5068-70. Test House: D9, D5067. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42315 G, 42413 G, 42629 G, 43903 G, 44248/334/368 I, 44444 G, 44514 G, 44580 I, 44596 G, 47547 I, 48009 G, 48097/146/386/446 G, 48543 I, 48716 G, 73045 I, 75058 I, 80086 G. Stripping: 43809/999. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay: 44235/429 I, 73013/127 I, 75052 I, 80141 I. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E (D5071-7) D8, 3 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D-E (D10-D12). Yard: 40413/680/925, 41975, 42312/54/61/507, 43370, 43531/665/759/998, 44140/50/274/326/79, 47299/309/482, 48205, 58190, 73129/32, 75054, 10100/800, D2/5, D2910, D5014, D5718, D8002. |
SLS/196001 |
14/01/1960 |
Derby Works (Paint Shop) |
Paint Shop: M.R.1000, 43911 I, 44274 G, 48097 G, 48205 I, 75054 I. Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12097/8, 13090, D5004, D8209. New Work: 6 D-E Sh., 0-6-0 (D3937-D3942). Test House: D5068/9/70. Diesel Finishing Shop: D7/10, D5016/71/2. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42394 G, 42502/13 G, 43342/682 I, 44098/381 G, 47377/429/45 G, 48181 I, 48355 G, 48382/436 I, 48607 G, 75051/61/4 I, Str., 48338/545. Erecting Shop, No. 2.Bay: 42315 G, 42533 I, 44160 I, 73133/4 (Cas.) Str., 42293, 43832. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: D1, 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E (D5073-81). 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E (D11-D14). Yard: 40413. 41763, 42354, 43370, 43531/828, 47309/67, 48387/424, 10100/800, D4/5/6/9, D5014. |
SLS/196002 |
31/12/1961 |
Crewe Works (Out-side Paint Shop) |
Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. |
SLS/196202 |
12/08/1964 |
Crewe Works (Arrival Sidings) |
Arrival Sidings: 41264, 42233/581/651, 44836/8/934, 45005/38/249, 46487, 48050/205/301/556/617, 78023, 84028. Paint Shop: D1589, D1611/2/3/5/6, 26057, 27006, L.M.S. 6233 Duchess of Sutherland (painted in L.M.S. livery for Butlin's Camp, Ayrshire), 49395, Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D230/41/82, D302/22, D1610, D6826/36, 48641. Paint Shop Yard: 42210/152, 48158/62/462, 78010, 92203. Diesel Test Road: D207, D1614, D8053. Erecting Shop: New Construction D1619-D1636 in various stages of construction, D203/74/6/9/83, D304/6/29/33/84/6, D5719, D6843, D8009/13/17/55, 42134/577/611, 44695/946, 45003/338, 45558, 48104/36/215/18/87/305/531/710/67, 92001/59/166/77, 92205/12. No. 9 Shop: D1617/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 48010/193/466, 84026, 92042. Works Yard: D217/8/89/91, D350, D5706/16, D6758, D8045, 42115/697, 44593/937, 45297/325, 48002/153/267/426/548/53/676, 70001/9/36/51, 78044. Electric Traction Shop: E3021, 26033/52, D288, D315/24. Scrap Road: 48069/155/203/310/657/745, 84021/2. Dismantling Shed: 42090/614/86, 48335/64/494/540, 84025, 92065. |
SLS/196409 |
20/09/1964 |
Crewe Works (Arrival Sidings) |
Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. |
SLS/196410 |
10/10/1964 |
Crewe Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: D1631-6 Motors, D1636-43 Equip., D1644-53 bodies; D243/71/87/97, D345/77/90/9, D5706/16, D6737, D8038/44/7, 42187, 42546, 44715, 44803/57, 44934, 45038, 45307/92, 48081, 48155/205/310/34/552/617, 70033/53, 78023, 84028, 92024/98, 92100; New Erecting shop: D324/36/8/53, 26025/57, 27005. Traverser Area: D237 on test, D1630 on test, D301/5/80/2, D5714, D6787/911, E3014, 26030, 44838, 45005/191, 45455, 48002/24/46/160/435/639/719/21, 70002/22, 92233; Paint shop: D221, D1627/8, D8017; Outside paint shop: D290, D304/48, D1629, 44688/779/846, 46847, 48356, 84015/25; Works yard: D232, 44710/74/985, 45279, 46484, 46519, 48306/57/533/654/740, 70011/34, 80072, 92008/74/9. |
SLS/196411 |