|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/08/1964 | Crewe Works (Scrap Road) | Arrival Sidings: 41264, 42233/581/651, 44836/8/934, 45005/38/249, 46487, 48050/205/301/556/617, 78023, 84028. Paint Shop: D1589, D1611/2/3/5/6, 26057, 27006, L.M.S. 6233 Duchess of Sutherland (painted in L.M.S. livery for Butlin's Camp, Ayrshire), 49395, Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D230/41/82, D302/22, D1610, D6826/36, 48641. Paint Shop Yard: 42210/152, 48158/62/462, 78010, 92203. Diesel Test Road: D207, D1614, D8053. Erecting Shop: New Construction D1619-D1636 in various stages of construction, D203/74/6/9/83, D304/6/29/33/84/6, D5719, D6843, D8009/13/17/55, 42134/577/611, 44695/946, 45003/338, 45558, 48104/36/215/18/87/305/531/710/67, 92001/59/166/77, 92205/12. No. 9 Shop: D1617/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 48010/193/466, 84026, 92042. Works Yard: D217/8/89/91, D350, D5706/16, D6758, D8045, 42115/697, 44593/937, 45297/325, 48002/153/267/426/548/53/676, 70001/9/36/51, 78044. Electric Traction Shop: E3021, 26033/52, D288, D315/24. Scrap Road: 48069/155/203/310/657/745, 84021/2. Dismantling Shed: 42090/614/86, 48335/64/494/540, 84025, 92065. | SLS/196409 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1942 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8203 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24784 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A) | ||
13/11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48203 | ||
27/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) | ||
24/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
16/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) | ||
18/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
07/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northwich (9G) | ||
30/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
22/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (2A) | ||
10/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) | ||
08/05/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
02/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bescot (2F) | ||
12/03/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
23/04/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48203 | ||
07/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |