29/02/1948 |
St Rollox Works |
The following locomotives have been painted in the temporary B.R. livery, i.e. unlined black with plain white lettering (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date):-Nos. 615 (4458) 9/2; 642 (4340) 18/2; 666 (4339) 1/3; 914 (4014) 17/2; 938 (4457) 26/2; 1138 (3555) 24/2; 2736 (4170) 29/2; 2749 (3336) 26/2; 2914 (4272) 20/2; 4323 (3817) 20/2; 5012 (9064) 9/2; 5018 (9829) 20/2; 5081 (9069) 2/2; 5082 (9005) 4/2; 5117 (9179) 24/2; 5127 (9713) 10/2; 5359 (9599) 19/2; 5459 (9593) 27/2; 5575 (9023) 10/2; 8185 (9912) 5/2; 8303 (10030) 12/2; 14476 (6173) 16/2; 14487 (6179) 25/2; 14501 (6209) 11/2; 17269 (910) 16/2; 17600 (1681) 11/2 and 17666 (1747) 12/2. No. 17313 arrived in the shops ex the dump on 20/2 and was cut up on 23/2. The boiler (Class N34 No. 1161) is to be repaired and used again |
SLS/194804 |
09/06/1959 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) |
Paint Shop-44028 I, 44092 G, 44211 G, 44588 G, D3772 New. Tender for 41000. No. 2835/1902 (3500 galls). Diesel Erecting Shop-ED4, ED5, 10202, 12034/53/54/56/62. New Work 8 D-E Sh. D3773-D3780 new. Test House-D1, D3491. Diesel Finishing Shop-D2, D5019, D5700/1. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay-42400 I, 43920 I, 44229 G, 47259 I, 47623 G, 48170 G, 48184 G, 48185 I, 48192 G, 48215 G, 48420 G, 48643 I, 48690 G, 48700 G, 73033 G, 73138 I, Stripping-42305/7, 42818, 44213. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay-41000 (complete, ready for paint shop), 44202 I, 45057 Casual, 45275 Casual, 48191 I, 80062 I ; Stripping - 48180. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay-5 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D/E (D3-D7); 8 Bo-Bo, 1160 H.P. D/E (D5020-D5027). Yard-40047, 40413, 40420, 40550, 40680, 42354, 43223, 43873, 43939, 43970, 44597, 45128, 47309, 47538, 48356, 48385, 53806 Frames, 58279, 10100, 10800, 13084, D5018, Cecil Raikes. |
SLS/195907 |
16/10/1961 |
Derby Works (In Works Sidings) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D6, D211, D312, D2908/9/13, D5084/9, 10203, 11146. Diesel Test House: D3, D138/9, D226, 11145, 12100. Shunter Test House: 12096. New Building: D142-D151. Finishing Shop: D76, D140/1, D5024, D8000. Erecting Shop: D3578, 12078, 13122/3, 42198, 42368, 42421, 44172/8, 44213/94, 44436, 47250, 47350/88/99, 48001/53/7, 48356, 48439, 58850 frames only, 73073, 73137/59, 75015/30/5. Paint Shop: 42408, 44185, 48491, 73010. In Works Sidings: ED3, D1, D10, D43, D75, D89, D2501, D5143, 10202, 12000/54, 41168, 41804, 42328, 42404, 42510/21/4, 43295, 43593, 43905, 44033, 44232/48, 47218/68/98, 47529, 47666, 48009/10, 48185, 48380, 73158, 75017, 92059. |
SLS/196111 |
05/11/1961 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Works Sidings: 12000, 42332, 42404, 43368, 43826, 43905/75, 44033, 44581, 47268, 47529, 47666, Cecil Raikes. Gasworks Siding: 44263, 47472. Erecting Shop: D3015/22, 12054/68/84, 12100, 13123, 41804, 42421, 42503, 43593, 43620, 44130, 44241, 44401, 44560, 47298, 47521, 48009, 48110/85/92, 48304/80, 48467, 58850, 73073, 73156/8, 75030/52. Diesel Finishing Shop: D89, D140/2/3, D8017/37. Diesel Test House: D141, D211/26. Outside Diesel Test House: D43, D80, D2501. New Erecting Shop: D144-54. Diesel Shunter Test House: 13122. Paint Shop: M.R.1000. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2908/9, D5024, D5143, 10202/3, 11145. Outside Diesel Repair Shop: D2504, 11118. Shed Road: 41168, 42328, 42510/21/4, 43295. |
SLS/196112 |
17/11/1961 |
Derby MPD (17A) (Ex-Works on Shed) |
Ex-Works on Shed: D211, D5024, 41804, 42421, 44241, 48185, 48467, 73073, 75030/52. |
SLS/196112 |
01/04/1964 |
Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) |
Erecting Shop: New Construction, D1583-98 (in various stages), D205/27/46/70/86, D303/7/28/30/83/87, D5717, D6775/84, D6863/78, D8002/6/7/23/50, 44918, 45382/408/577/626, 46443, 48169/225/69/474/528/615/37/95/729/42, 70000/4/10, 82009 92121/22. Outside Erecting Shop: D300, D5719, D6783/9, 45426, 48154/436/742/50, 78041, 92137. Electric Shop: D204, D6843, E3007, 26000/9, 27003. Yard: 42055/81, 42410/583/699, 43957, 44405, 44676/873/917/87, 45217/372/445, 45569/658, 46436/41/524, 48073/258/332/424/613/749, 84021/3/4, 92002/62/156/73. Inside and Around Paint Shop: New Construction, D1563, D1567-82. Weigh Shed: 48753. Outside Paint Shop: D201/23/339, 26006, 45069/75, 48185/436/734, 92082/163. Inside Paint Shop: D259, D311, D1034, 49395, 92053 and L.M.S. 6229 Duchess of Hamilton, painted in L.M.S livery (for a Butlins Camp). |
SLS/196405 |