|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/06/1959 | Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) | Paint Shop-44028 I, 44092 G, 44211 G, 44588 G, D3772 New. Tender for 41000. No. 2835/1902 (3500 galls). Diesel Erecting Shop-ED4, ED5, 10202, 12034/53/54/56/62. New Work 8 D-E Sh. D3773-D3780 new. Test House-D1, D3491. Diesel Finishing Shop-D2, D5019, D5700/1. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay-42400 I, 43920 I, 44229 G, 47259 I, 47623 G, 48170 G, 48184 G, 48185 I, 48192 G, 48215 G, 48420 G, 48643 I, 48690 G, 48700 G, 73033 G, 73138 I, Stripping-42305/7, 42818, 44213. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay-41000 (complete, ready for paint shop), 44202 I, 45057 Casual, 45275 Casual, 48191 I, 80062 I ; Stripping - 48180. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay-5 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D/E (D3-D7); 8 Bo-Bo, 1160 H.P. D/E (D5020-D5027). Yard-40047, 40413, 40420, 40550, 40680, 42354, 43223, 43873, 43939, 43970, 44597, 45128, 47309, 47538, 48356, 48385, 53806 Frames, 58279, 10100, 10800, 13084, D5018, Cecil Raikes. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1942 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8184 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24756 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Motherwell (28A) | ||
27/03/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48184 | ||
27/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) | ||
30/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
07/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
18/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) | ||
10/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
23/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) | ||
15/02/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) | ||
11/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) | ||
10/04/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (16G) | ||
17/07/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48184 | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |