31/12/1948 |
Crewe Works |
New Work December: 'IVĀ° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with. Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque. |
SLS/194902 |
13/03/1961 |
Derby Works (In Works Sidings) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: ED2, D3, D232, D2501/8, D2909/10, D3052, D3126, D3778, D8006, 10203, 11116, 12077, 13119. Test House: ED4, D16, D79, D213/21, D5092, 12000. New Building: D9, D25-D33. Finishing Shop: D23/4, D5090, D5133, 10202. Erecting Shop: 42067, 42500/27, 44376, 47202/97, 47313, 47415/30, 47577, 47612/40, 48000/24/81, 48133, 48216, 48607/17/44, 48728, 53806, 75033/9/50/9, 92129. Paint Shop: D22, M1000, 42221, 42317, 43885, 44542, 48351. In Works Sidings: D210, D3172, D5065/72, 40695, 41536, 42134, 42300/67, 42414, 43306, 43574, 44480, 47204, 47312/8/47/72, 47408/39, 47507, 48063, 48121/43, 48153, 48219, 48690, 58850. Ex Works Shed: 10000, 42211, 42391, 42508, 44085, 44264, 44581, 47416, 48701, 75016. |
SLS/196104 |
13/04/1961 |
Derby Works (Paint Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D210/69, D2501/8, D2903/9, D3126/72, D8006, 11116, 12077, 13119, 13245. Test House: ED2, D24/7, D76, D83, D255/68, D2910, D5015/61/89, D5140, 10203, 11114. New Building: D28-37, Finishing Shop: D74, D223/92, 10202. Erecting Shop: 42077, 42092, 42367, 42414/39, 42522, 43972, 44102, 44284, 44538, 44603, 47675, 48114, 48220/4, 48447, 48695, 53806, 73014/39, 73126/7. Paint Shop: D26, D78, M1000, 44177, 47278, 47318, 48143. In Works Sidings: D68, D86, D88, D3069, D5701, 12000, 41529/36, 41835, 42281, 44067/85/91, 44195, 44269, 47305/24/90, 47533, 48003, 48121, 48336, 48666, 58850, 73157. Ex-Works Shed: D79, D230, D3052, 47415/39, 48063, 48153, 48219, 48690. |
SLS/196105 |
27/11/1966 |
Locations of stored steam locomotives (Colwick) |
Toton-27/11/66 78061/4. Stored Colwick-44811/47/941/84, 45224/89/464, 48073/83/127/37/43/77/90/361/76/88/414/32/538/635/45/51/62/72/90. No steam at Colwick since 5/12/66. |
SLS/196701 |
31/12/1966 |
Colwick MPD (Stored) |
Stored 44847/941/84, 45224/89, 48083/143/361/70/88/651/62/72. Also on shed Dept.29 in steam. |
SLS/196702 |