Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2960 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16366 Week
» 69382 Month
» 188909 Year
» 3215762 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8135 |
m/e |
05/1941 |
British Railways |
48135 |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
Lot-154 |
To Service |
During 05/1941 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 11/09/1965 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1941 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8135 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-154 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton Mersey (19D) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48135 |
|
|
11/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (13D) |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D) |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
11/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48135 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|