Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 796 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14839 Week
» 79793 Month
» 282457 Year
» 3309310 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8131 |
m/e |
03/1941 |
British Railways |
48131 |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
Lot-154 |
To Service |
During 03/1941 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/05/1967 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1941 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8131 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-154 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Normanton (20D) |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48131 |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kettering (15B) |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
20/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
27/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48131 |
|
|
10/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|