Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1535 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19338 Week
» 72354 Month
» 191881 Year
» 3218734 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8127 |
m/e |
01/1941 |
British Railways |
48127 |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
Lot-154 |
To Service |
During 01/1941 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/10/1966 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1945 |
Wellingborough |
During the last two weeks in December, there were numerous strangers in this area, helping with the Christmas workings when some expresses ran in as many as six parts-an unprecedented occurrence on the Midland Division. Locos noted included 324, 931 (20B); 1181 (19A), 2339 (21A), 2814 (2D), 4017 (19C), 4843 (22A), 4916, 5070 (1A), 5381 (5A), 5403 (5A), 5410 (8A), 5657 (22A), 8127 (20A), 8162 (20C), 8373 (4A). 2129, 2518 (13D), and 7312 (13B) have been seen working through light en route for shops. W.D. tanks 71473 an 71535 were dead in the loco yard on 23/12, but disappeared next day. |
SLS/194604 |
27/11/1966 |
Locations of stored steam locomotives (Colwick) |
Toton-27/11/66 78061/4. Stored Colwick-44811/47/941/84, 45224/89/464, 48073/83/127/37/43/77/90/361/76/88/414/32/538/635/45/51/62/72/90. No steam at Colwick since 5/12/66. |
SLS/196701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1941 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8127 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-154 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
21/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48127 |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) |
|
|
22/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
09/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
06/10/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kettering (15B) |
|
|
13/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (16G) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48127 |
|
|
01/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|