Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 181 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19092 Week
» 84046 Month
» 286710 Year
» 3313563 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8125 |
m/e |
06/1939 |
British Railways |
48125 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
Lot-149 |
To Service |
During 06/1939 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 28/10/1967 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1939 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8125 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-149 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48125 |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
13/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
26/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hasland (18C) |
|
|
10/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
06/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
05/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48125 |
|
|
08/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|