Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1623 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15029 Week
» 68045 Month
» 187572 Year
» 3214425 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8107 |
m/e |
02/1939 |
British Railways |
48107 |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
Lot-143 |
To Service |
During 02/1939 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/04/1968 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1939 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8107 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-143 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Coalville (17C) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48107 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
26/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
28/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kettering (15B) |
|
|
23/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coalville (15E) |
|
|
22/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
18/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
17/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48107 |
|
|
07/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|