Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2039 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19842 Week
» 72858 Month
» 192385 Year
» 3219238 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8067 |
m/e |
11/1936 |
British Railways |
48067 |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
4744 |
To Service |
During 11/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 18/10/1967 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1968 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
55B |
Stourton |
3w/e |
30/09/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/10/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/09/1967 |
Eastern Region (North) Steam Locomotive Stock |
No less than 90 steam locomotives were withdrawn in September and the total steam stock at the 1st October, 1967, was reduced to 21 as under:- 1 C1.5 4-6-0 (45208 at Low Moor). 2 Jubilees (45562 Alberta and 45593 Kolhapur at Holbeck). 1 K1 2-6-0 (62005 at Holbeck-transferred from Tyne Dock). 17 8F 2-8-0 (48055/67/70/76/84/93, 48113/69, 48222/76, 48352, 48439/73, 48537/40, 48622/64-all at Royston). The following classes are now extinct:-W.D. 2-8-0, Q6 0-8-0, B1 4-6-0, J27 0-6-0 and Stanier and Fairburn 2-cyl. 2-6-4Ts. 65882 (J27) was the last North Eastern Railway locomotive and the last of the pre-grouping companies' standard gauge locomotives to remain in service. No locomotives at all remain in the wheel classification 0-8-0, 0-6-0 and 2-6-4T. The number of tanks in British Railways stock at 1st October is 7 ! (three LMS 0-6-0Ts and one LNE J94 0-6-OST at Westhouses and three GW narrow gauge 2-6-2Ts for the Vale of Rheidol at Aberystwyth). (Ed. Since the above was compiled, 45593 has arrived at Tyseley (Birmingham) for repainting and the three LMS 0-6-0Ts and the J94 were taken out of traffic on 4th October, when an N.C.B. diesel commenced work at Williamthorpe Colliery). |
SLS/196711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8067 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4744 |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kettering (15B) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kettering (15B) |
|
|
07/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48067 |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (55D) |
|
|
18/10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48067 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|