03/07/1958 |
Derby Works (Paint shop) |
Paint shop- 42310 G, 42530 I, 43991 I, 44044 G, 48056 G, 48419 I, 48644 G, D3529 (No. 27-new), D3530 (No. 28). Diesel erecting shop- 12066 G, 15004 Casual, D8015 Casual, new work (order no. D658) no. 29 (D3531) on test, nos. 30-39 (D3532-41) all engines mounted, nos. 46-50 (D3548-52) frames in stocks. Erecting shop (no. 2 bay)- 42308 I, 42528 G, 43514 G, 43822 G, 43906 I, 43932 I, 47535 I, 47660 I, 48694 G; Erecting shop (no. 1 bay)- 40010 G, 42336 G, 42348 G, 42373 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42391 G, 42541 G, 42680 I, 43459 I, 44288 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 75037 G, 75047 G, stripping- 42536 I, 47289 I, 47552 G; Erecting shop (no. 3 bay)-, new work Diesel main line-D5001-7 new (nos. 2-8) engines mounted on D5001-3; D1, D2 new (nos. 1 & 2) framework only. Yard- 40047, 40657, 40680, 42322, 42506/25/29, 44135/46/61, 44290, 47504, 53807, 58196, 75034, D8000, D5000. M.R. 118 has returned from Carlisle. |
SLS/195807 |
12/03/1961 |
Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) |
Works Yard: D3925, 40146, 42723/79, 42890, 43880, 44126, 44455, 44512/44, 48118/64, 48507, 48608, 48742/56, 51229, 51441/96, 52270, 52415. Scrap Yard: 50746, 52201/44, 52355. Erecting Shop: D3932-6, D4011/2, 12004/5/46, 42822/4/67/70, 42959/69/75/84, 43000/19, 44099, 44113/97, 44446, 44595, 48056, 48113, 48332, 48454, 48513, 48640/76, 48708, 76077/83, Car Shop: uM28306/81M, uM28586M. Paint Shop: 13247, uM28330M, and the usual preserved engines; Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. |
SLS/196105 |
12/08/1964 |
Crewe South MPD (Awaiting Works) |
On Shed Awaiting Works: 42072/267/436, 44667/738/814, 45716, 48056/220/351/365/450, 92098/157. Ex Works: 45344/85, 48468/516/746, 92104. |
SLS/196409 |
20/09/1964 |
Crewe Works (Arrival Sidings) |
Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. |
SLS/196410 |
15/11/1964 |
Crewe Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: D1641-1662; D214, D224, D236, D257, D351, D395/7, D5700/14, D6833/49, D8014/26/35/59, 42581, 42665, 44689, 44710/74, 45215/79, 46484, 48056, 48190, 48301, 48533/56, 48719/40, 92008/74/9/87/8; Near Chester line: 44715, 44844, 44988, 45000, 45660, 46402, 92019; Side of Works: 42089, 42218, 42569, 44658, 44778, 44838, 44989, 45035, 45303, 45412, 45562, 46501, 48168, 48612, 92004/64, 92117/67. Paint shop area: D251, D297, D305, D329, D336, D369, D1633/4/5/7/8/9/40, D5716, D6889, D8058, 42233, 48046/50, 70002/11/34, 92233; Cutting up: 42221, 42559; New Erecting shop: D338, E3002/4, 26025; Inspection road: 44667, 45031, 48206/52, 92139/57; Misc.: 42267/97, 44730, 45089, 45130, 48153/92, 48212/67, 48345/65, 48455, 48529, 48677/85, 48764, 70015/18/37, 80072, 92206, D219, D293, D6774, D8001/36, 26049. |
SLS/196412 |