Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 483 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18286 Week
» 71302 Month
» 190829 Year
» 3217682 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
70573 |
m/e |
09/1936 |
British Railways |
48045 |
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
4722 |
To Service |
During 09/1936 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/05/1968 off Edge Hill (8A) |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 8 mths , 3 dys |
Information |
WD 70573 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1936 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 70573 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4722 |
|
|
23/07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48045 |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shoeburyness (13D) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (NTH) |
|
|
11/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
29/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (8E) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
14/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (16G) |
|
|
23/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E) |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
04/05/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48045 from Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|