Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2217 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15623 Week
» 68639 Month
» 188166 Year
» 3215019 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8017 |
m/e |
01/1937 |
British Railways |
48017 |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
Lot-130 |
To Service |
During 01/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/11/1967 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8017 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-130 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48017 |
|
|
30/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
23/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
10/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (8E) |
|
|
13/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (8L) |
|
|
17/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
04/11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48017 |
|
|
07/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|