Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 908 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14314 Week
» 67330 Month
» 186857 Year
» 3213710 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
C16 |
m/e |
11/1942 |
British Railways |
33016 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
Q1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 11/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 25/08/1963 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 9 mths , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/07/1961 |
Ashford Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1942 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number C16 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33016 |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
21/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
13/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
25/08/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33016 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|