Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 58 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4570 Week
» 27076 Month
» 330266 Year
» 1551831 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2594 m/e 06/1904
British Railways 32594 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 06/1904
Withdrawal During 03/1951
Scrapping During 04/1951
Service Life 46 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1904
HOR Horsham on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EBN Eastbourne 4w/e 01/04/1948
TOSTORE EBN Eastbourne 5w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC BTN Brighton 3w/e 28/05/1949
WDN   w/e 10/02/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
22/11/1949 Brighton Works On 22/11 'Leader' Class No. 36001 was still running trial trips with empty coaches, but had not yet been handed over to the Running Dept. No. 36002 was stored in the Electric Car Sheds at Brighton. Locomotives in shops on 16/11 were: Nos. 2386, 32498, 2528, 32538, 2594, 2655, 77340, 90247, 90354, 90375 (78569). 90622/69 and Diesel No. 3. Some of the W.D. locomotives carry the new numbers on the cab side, but the old number on, the buffer beam has not yet been painted out. New 'W.C.' No. 34096 Trevone left the Works fully painted on 15/11 . SLS/194912
30/06/1950 Brighton Works New construction: 4-6-2 34110; 2-6-4T 42097-42166, the first three being in a forward stage. 42096 came out early in July and bears a Brighton date plate, 1950. In for repair: 0-6-OT 515S; 0-6-2T 32460, 32594; 4-4-2T 32083; 2-6-0 32347; 2-8-0 77030, 77108, 77359; 4-6-2 34036, 34045 Ottery St. Mary, 34038 Lynton, 34082 615 Squadron. 34036 will probably now receive its name-plates Westward Ho!: this was the engine which was fitted to burn oil on the Laidlaw-Drew method till September 1948, when it was re-converted at Eastleigh to burn coal: for some reason the plates were not then affixed. The 'D.3' 32378 compares unfavourably in appearance with others of the class, as it is painted unlined black without even the usual emblem: on the other hand 32386 is kept in good condition, and the lining and emblem make it look attractive. The class 'G.6' tank recently repaired at Brighton has not been renumbered 30272 as anticipated, but is now DS3152 with tanks lettered -Engineer's Dept.' Meldon Quarry.' There is no mention of British Railways on the tanks.
B.O.B. 34074 is now named 46 Squadron. Engines going through Brighton shops hitherto have been very thoroughly brought into line with latest ideas as to lettering, etc., but 'R.1' bogie tank 31706 has had SOUTHERN replaced by the B.R. totem, yet still retaining the green shaded numerals on the bunker. The side tanks only have been repainted.
SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1904 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2594
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Horsham (HOR)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 32594    
03/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 32594    

prev