Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 67 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4579 Week
» 27085 Month
» 330275 Year
» 1551840 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2593 m/e 05/1904
British Railways 32593 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 05/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/01/1956
Scrapping During 01/1956
Service Life 51 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1904
3B Three Bridges on 01/01/1948
75B Redhill 4w/e 08/12/1950
75G Eastbourne 4w/e 05/02/1951
74C Dover Marine 4w/e 06/10/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 14/01/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 3Br Three Bridges 5w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC EBN Eastbourne 5w/e 12/02/1949
TOSTORE 75G Eastbourne m/e 31/08/1950
REINS 74C Dover Marine 5w/e 08/10/1951
WDN   w/e 14/01/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1904 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2593
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Three Bridges (3B )    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 32593    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
14/01/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 32593    

prev prev