Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 57 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4569 Week
» 27075 Month
» 330265 Year
» 1551830 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2592 m/e 04/1904
British Railways 32592 m/e 11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 04/1904
Withdrawal During 05/1953
Scrapping During 05/1953
Service Life 49 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1904
RED Redhill on 01/01/1948
75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 08/12/1950
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 05/02/1951
70D Basingstoke 6w/e 05/09/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RED Redhill P 02/01/1948
REINS 70D Basingstoke 6w/e 05/09/1951
WDN   w/e 18/04/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/08/1950 S.R. Renumbering The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. SLS/195012

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1904 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2592
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 32592    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
05/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
05/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 32592    

prev prev