Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 65 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4577 Week
» 27083 Month
» 330273 Year
» 1551838 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2591 m/e 04/1904
British Railways 32591 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 04/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/11/1954
Scrapping During 03/1955
Service Life 50 yrs, 7 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1904
TWW Tunbridge Wells West on 01/01/1948
75E Three Bridges 4w/e 08/12/1950
70D Basingstoke 4w/e 06/10/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 27/11/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BTN Brighton 9w/e 01/06/1948
REINS 70D Basingstoke 5w/e 08/10/1951
TOSTORE   6w/e 18/11/1953
REINS 70C Guildford 10w/e 10/12/1953
TOSTORE 70D Basingstoke 6w/e 30/12/1953
WDN   w/e 27/11/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1904 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2591
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tunbridge Wells West (TWW)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 32591    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
27/11/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 32591    

prev prev