Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 58 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4570 Week
» 27076 Month
» 330266 Year
» 1551831 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2590 m/e 04/1904
British Railways 32590 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 04/1904
Withdrawal During 09/1951
Scrapping During 11/1951
Service Life 47 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1904
TWW Tunbridge Wells West on 01/01/1948
70D Basingstoke 4w/e 11/04/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RED Redhill 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke 4w/e 13/04/1951
WDN   w/e 18/08/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1904 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2590
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tunbridge Wells West (TWW)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 32590    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
09/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 32590    

prev prev