Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 4893 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20505 Week
» 119150 Month
» 321814 Year
» 3348667 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2590 |
m/e |
04/1904 |
British Railways |
32590 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Large Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 04/1904 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1951 |
Service Life |
47 yrs , 5 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
RED |
Redhill |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
70D |
Basingstoke |
4w/e |
13/04/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/08/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
26/10/1951 |
Brighton Works |
New construction, 80021 well advanced, laid down to 80027, Under repair, DS1173, 377S, 15217, 20002, 31638, 31849, 31853, 32168, 32376, 32464, 32479, 42101. Being cut up, 32590. Waiting scrapping, 32075, 32021. Nos. 31849/53 bear R.O.F. Nos. 26 and 29 respectively. Recently ex shops: 80019 (20/10) for S.R.; 80020 (27/10) for Sc.R.; 31691 (26/10); 80013 and others of the class after attention to leaky tanks. An unusual visitor to Brighton shed is 30163 (L.11); 32347 with damaged front end is understood to be waiting decision as to repair or scrap. No. 41297 was on shed on 7th November. |
SLS/195112 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2590 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tunbridge Wells West (TWW) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (RED) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32590 |
|
|
11/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
13/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
09/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32590 |
|
|
11/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|