Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 41 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4553 Week
» 27059 Month
» 330249 Year
» 1551814 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2588 m/e 12/1903
British Railways 32588 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 12/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/12/1953
Scrapping During y/e 1954
Service Life 50 yrs , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1903
EBN Eastbourne on 01/01/1948
75A Brighton 4w/e 08/12/1950
75G Eastbourne 4w/e 05/02/1951
75A Brighton 8w/e 07/10/1952
   Withdrawn w/e 12/12/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75A Brighton 10w/e 07/10/1952
WDN   w/e 12/12/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/02/1951 Eastbourne stored locomotives Actually stored at Eastbourne on 15th February: I.lx Nos. 32005, 2009, 2595, 2603; E.5 Nos. 32571/88; B.4 Nos. 2054/62/3/8; B.4x Nos. 32043, 2052/5, 2060, 32071/2/3 (17 locos.). SLS/195103

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1903 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2588
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastbourne (EBN)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 32588    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G)    
07/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
12/12/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 32588    

prev prev