Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 69 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4581 Week
» 27087 Month
» 330277 Year
» 1551842 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2587 m/e 12/1903
British Railways 32587 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 12/1903
Withdrawal During 11/1954
Scrapping During 11/1954
Service Life 50 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1903
BTN Brighton on 01/01/1948
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 09/09/1950
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 08/12/1950
75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 06/10/1951
75A Brighton 9w/e 30/06/1952
70D Basingstoke 4w/e 10/12/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 75A Brighton m/e 31/08/1950
REINS 75F Tunbridge Wells West 5w/e 08/10/1951
TOSTORE 75F Tunbridge Wells West 7w/e 21/01/1952
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke 2w/e 10/06/1953
WDN   on 16/10/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1903 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2587
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 32587    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
10/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
11/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 32587    

prev prev