Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 67 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4579 Week
» 27085 Month
» 330275 Year
» 1551840 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2585 m/e 12/1903
British Railways 32585 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 12/1903
Withdrawal During 06/1954
Scrapping During 01/1955
Service Life 50 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1903
3B Three Bridges on 01/01/1948
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 09/09/1950
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 08/12/1950
75F Tunbridge Wells West 7w/e 27/06/1951
75A Brighton 8w/e 07/10/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 75E Three Bridges m/e 31/08/1950
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 75A Brighton 10w/e 07/10/1952
WDN   on 22/05/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/01/1950 Ashford Works Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. SLS/195002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1903 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2585
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Three Bridges (3B )    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 32585    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
07/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
06/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 32585    

prev prev