Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 68 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4580 Week
» 27086 Month
» 330276 Year
» 1551841 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2584 m/e 11/1903
British Railways 32584 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 11/1903
Withdrawal During 02/1951
Scrapping During 04/1951
Service Life 47 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1903
HOR Horsham on 01/01/1948
75E Three Bridges 4w/e 09/09/1950
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 5w/e 09/10/1950
WDN   on 27/01/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1903 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2584
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Horsham (HOR)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 32584    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
02/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 32584    

prev prev