Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 75 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4587 Week
» 27093 Month
» 330283 Year
» 1551848 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2583 m/e 11/1903
British Railways 32583 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 11/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/01/1956
Scrapping During 01/1956
Service Life 52 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1903
BTN Brighton on 01/01/1948
75D Horsham 4w/e 06/10/1951
70D Basingstoke 4w/e 11/12/1954
   Withdrawn w/e 21/01/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
REINS 75D Horsham 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 75A Brighton w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke 4w/e 11/12/1954
WDN   w/e 21/01/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102
05/03/1951 Ashford Works In shops: s1178, 1245, 1252, 31320, 31401/5, 31509, 31616, 31753/75/85, 31820/6/48, s1825, s1871, 32169, 2487, 32502/4/43, 33005/23/8, 78597. In yard : 1107, 1157, 31502/19/21/32, 1714/30, 31745, 31925, 32402, 2447, 32525, 32523/94, 33039, 90226. For scrap : 1443, 1547, 32301, 32584. Recently ex shops: lined black 31305, 31611, 31766/97, 31822, 32492, 32583.
No. 32553 ('C2x') has left Ashford after general overhaul, with two domes. There are still a number of boilers so fitted which are inter-changed from time to time, though the second dome has served no purpose since the top-feed arrangement with which it was associated by the L. B.& S.C.R. was discontinued in 1930 under Southern auspices. The ranks of the famous 'I.3' tanks are being rapidly depleted since the advent of the new Class 4 MT Tanks.
SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1903 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2583
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 32583    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Horsham (75D)    
11/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
21/01/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 32583    

prev prev