Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 831 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14237 Week
» 67253 Month
» 186780 Year
» 3213633 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2579 |
m/e |
07/1903 |
British Railways |
32579 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 07/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/11/1959 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1903 |
NORW |
|
Norwood Junction |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
TOSTORE |
71A |
Eastleigh |
3w/e |
10/10/1955 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
05/06/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/04/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
Noted 28.4.51-30066, 82, 30331, 30477/90/99, 30589 (being lined out), 30689, 30781/91/93, 30843, 30920/33/50, 2138, 32351, 32661 (lined out), 3441, 34007/25/49/55/79/99, 34103, 35003/10. Nos. 32328 an 32608 ex shops, lined, also 32094 (ex W/E 21/4/51). Waiting shops: 30305/14, 30829, 34002/6/30, 30197. Being cut up: 30446, 36001(!). Waiting cutting-up: 116, 30156/73, 441. Increased coal capacity: 32510/79 fitted at Eastleigh shed with coal rails for use on Fawley branch. An Adams Al2, withdrawn in 1946 is acting as stationary boiler and is re-numbered DS3191. The frames and cylinders of 722 are in good condition and are being retained as spares for the class. |
SLS/195106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2579 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32579 |
|
|
14/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32579 |
|
|
12/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|