Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 66 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4578 Week
» 27084 Month
» 330274 Year
» 1551839 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2575 m/e 03/1903
British Railways 32575 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 03/1903
Withdrawal During 12/1951
Scrapping During y/e 1952
Service Life 48 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1903
EBN Eastbourne on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EBN Eastbourne m/e 30/06/1947
REINS 75A Brighton m/e 31/08/1950
WDN   w/e 03/11/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1947 Brighton Works : No. 21C156 Croydon and 'Austerity' 77122 have just been through shops; the former has the new pattern cab and longer deflector plates. Engines in shops in mid-November were 21C126 (new deflectors and old cab-off 21C156), 21C170 Manston fully painted), 680S, 1414, 1826/80, 2022, 2039 Hartland Point, 2083/9, 2153, 2339/66, 2436/43/55/62/89/90, 2523/46/75. For the first time for many months the shops are without an 'Austerity' and old Brighton types preponderate. It is interesting to point out that the name Croydon was borne by Rennie's 0-4-2 of 1838 (London and Croydon Ry. No. 2), but apart from this engine-which became S.E.R. No. 2 as from 31/1/1846-three engines of this name have been seen on Brighton metals as follows: Craven's 2-2-2 No. 128 which was commenced by Dodds & Son of Rotherham in 1866 and finished off at Brighton Works in June, 1871, and named Croydon by Mr. Stroudley: scrapped in 1888. Stroudley's 0-4-2 No. 181, built at Brighton (estd. Works No. 463), completed early in 1890 by R. J. Billinton, and scrapped in 1929. Bulleid's 'West Country' Class No. 21C156, completed in February, 1947, and modified in November to the 'Battle of Britain' Class (estd. Works No. 1004). SLS/194712

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1903 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2575
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastbourne (EBN)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 32575    
12/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 32575    

prev prev