Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 68 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4580 Week
» 27086 Month
» 330276 Year
» 1551841 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 2574 m/e 02/1903
British Railways 32574 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Billinton
Class Large Radials
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 02/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/06/1951
Scrapping During 07/1951
Service Life 48 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1903
EBN Eastbourne on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 23/06/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE EBN Eastbourne 5w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC EBN Eastbourne 4w/e 12/03/1949
WDN   w/e 23/06/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1903 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2574
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastbourne (EBN)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 32574    
23/06/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 32574    

prev prev